U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00273-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITHEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Exam Report SEALED]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Motions No Longer Submitted]
  • August 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 01, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 07, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arrest]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.