U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GAITHER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • January 18, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 18, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 12, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
  • January 05, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.