U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00395-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • February 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 27, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 19, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.