U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00077-3
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 27, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 24, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 03, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • February 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.