U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FREELAND
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • October 08, 2024: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • October 08, 2024: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.