U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00447-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCollum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 12, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Release Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.