U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
  • January 12, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
  • January 11, 2022: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.