U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Other]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 09, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Service by Publication]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 05, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • May 05, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • May 05, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • January 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.