U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Raudales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 13, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 09, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.