U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiggins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 04, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.