U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pulley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Seal ]
  • August 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.