U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dominguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.