U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Inman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 21, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2022: [Suppress ]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 12, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.