U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leonard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 12, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.