U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAWSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.