U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUTROW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 24, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arrest]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [SEALED USPO Amended Petition]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 18, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 17, 2022: [Probation Petition Amended 12C/Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED USPO Amended Petition]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.