U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Accept Early Payment of Monetary Penalties]
  • June 28, 2022: [Accept Early Payment of Monetary Penalties]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 28, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 14, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • January 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.