U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GABRIEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • April 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 27, 2022: [SEALED Order for Summons]
  • January 24, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • January 24, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 19, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • January 19, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • January 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 14, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.