U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00434-16
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Travel ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Unseal Indictment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Travel ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • July 20, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • July 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • July 14, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Travel ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Travel ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 31, 2022: [Travel ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • May 06, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • May 06, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 31, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • March 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • February 17, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 16, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 26, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • January 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 24, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 24, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.