U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pagan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Other - USCA]
  • November 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Addendum]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 18, 2022: [Addendum]
  • November 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response - other]
  • November 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Other - USCA]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 03, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Other - USCA]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judge or Jury Notes]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 05, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Jury Verdict on Forfeiture]
  • October 05, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • October 05, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • October 04, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 03, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • October 02, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 29, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 28, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • September 20, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • September 19, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 02, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 01, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adopt Motions of Co-defendants]
  • August 16, 2022: [Adopt Motions of Co-defendants]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 28, 2022: [Suppress]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • June 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Reset Docket Call and Excludable]
  • June 01, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Unexecuted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 23, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 23, 2022: [In Limine]
  • May 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • May 20, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • May 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence - Government]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 16, 2022: [Indictment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Indictment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.