U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gladney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for 5K Departure]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Seal ]
  • September 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 17, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • January 24, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.