U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00294-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adefemi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • April 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 17, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Dismiss ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.