U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noyola, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • March 12, 2025: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 22, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.