U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weise
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.