U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strong
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Mandate - USCA]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 24, 2023: [Exhibit]
  • January 24, 2023: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue Other]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • September 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue Other]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Service by Publication]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 13, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 26, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.