U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arena-De Los Santos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Service by Publication]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 11, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 26, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.