U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cotton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 08, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 02, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 21, 2022: [SEALED Revocation of Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 20, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.