U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FULTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 09, 2024: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Probation Petition 12B]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • February 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 28, 2022: [USPO PROB 12B - Modification to Conditions]
  • January 20, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.