U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rebollar-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.