U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crudup
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 29, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 31, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.