U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • December 29, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • December 22, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 29, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 01, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2022: [Factual Basis]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.