U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lawrence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 23, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 26, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.