U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Levy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 29, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 18, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • January 21, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.