U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 29, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Service by Publication]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 21, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • July 19, 2022: [Factual Basis]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 06, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.