U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valentine et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 21, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arrest]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 05, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2022
  • July 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2022: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 04, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 02, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 07, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.