U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caldwell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 28, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • November 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 10, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 04, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2022: [Bond]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.