U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response - other]
  • December 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 14, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 14, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 11, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 24, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.