U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasco-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 02, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Document]
  • May 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 05, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.