U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kalmar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report - Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Proposed Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.