U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Best
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [SEALED Transcript]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 11, 2023: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • February 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • February 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Remark]
  • February 01, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.