U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Castaneda et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue Other]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 08, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 03, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • February 08, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.