U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guevara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 18, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Factual Basis]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 01, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • February 01, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.