U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • December 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 31, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • October 31, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 31, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • October 21, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • October 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 20, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 14, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 06, 2022: [Indictment]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 17, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.