U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 11, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • July 08, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence - Government]
  • June 09, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Discovery]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • March 16, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Memorandum]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.