U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOBBS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • November 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 06, 2022: [Rule 32.1 Documents Received]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Probation Petition 12B]
  • May 26, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • May 26, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 23, 2022: [USPO PROB 12B - Modification to Conditions]
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.