U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Basnight
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 06, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 08, 2022: [Document]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.