U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lamb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice-other]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.