U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.