U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rolle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 11, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 21, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • February 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • February 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.