U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Release Status Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Release Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Text Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • January 25, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.